Global Patent Index - EP 0981831 A1

EP 0981831 A1 2000-03-01 - DISCHARGE LAMP WITH DIELECTRICALLY IMPEDED ELECTRODES

Title (en)

DISCHARGE LAMP WITH DIELECTRICALLY IMPEDED ELECTRODES

Title (de)

ENTLADUNGSLAMPE MIT DIELEKTRISCH BEHINDERTEN ELEKTRODEN

Title (fr)

LAMPE A DECHARGE AVEC ELECTRODES INHIBEES DIELECTRIQUEMENT

Publication

EP 0981831 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915495 A

Priority

  • DE 9900543 W
  • DE 19811520 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19811520C1] A dielectrically hindered discharge lamp (1) has a surrounding conductive screen (12, 13) separated from the electrodes (3-5) by a dielectric discharge vessel (2) with a thickness/dielectric constant ratio greater than that of the dielectric barrier (6-8). A discharge lamp (1) with a dielectric barrier (6-8) of thickness dB and dielectric constant iota B for promoting a dielectrically hindered discharge has an electrically conductive screen (12, 13) surrounding the discharge vessel (2) which consists of a dielectric of thickness dD and dielectric constant iota D such that dD/ iota D is \-1.5 \* dB/ iota B.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/04; H01J 65/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 65/00 (2006.01); H01J 61/04 (2006.01); H01J 65/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/04 (2013.01); H01J 65/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948134A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19811520 C1 19990812; AT 205961 T 20011015; CA 2289536 A1 19990923; CA 2289536 C 20070515; EP 0981831 A1 20000301; EP 0981831 B1 20010919; HU 0002438 A2 20001128; HU 0002438 A3 20011228; HU 223240 B1 20040428; JP 2001526828 A 20011218; JP 4108770 B2 20080625; US 6304028 B1 20011016; WO 9948134 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900265

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900265

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59900265

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59900265

- Effective date: 20130205

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59900265

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-10-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20100331

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090319

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090310

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-02-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070210

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060302

2005-03-07 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050307

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUE

2002-09-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUE

2002-06-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUE

2002-05-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUE

2002-05-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOLLKOMMER, FRANK, DR.

2002-05-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HITZSCHKE, LOTHAR, DR.

2002-03-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUE

2002-03-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOLLKOMMER, FRANK, DR.

2002-03-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HITZSCHKE, LOTHAR, DR.

2002-03-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUE

2002-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900265 20011025

2001-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-09-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 205961 T 20011015

2001-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991105

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL