Global Patent Index - EP 0981842 A1

EP 0981842 A1 2000-03-01 - HIGH FREQUENCY SEMICONDUCTOR LASER MODULE

Title (en)

HIGH FREQUENCY SEMICONDUCTOR LASER MODULE

Title (de)

HOCHFREQUENZ-HALBLEITERLASERMODUL

Title (fr)

MODULE DE LASER A SEMICONDUCTEUR HAUTE FREQUENCE

Publication

EP 0981842 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924030 A

Priority

  • DE 9800823 W
  • DE 19719853 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19719853A1] Disclosed is a high frequency semiconductor laser module with a silicone substrate, especially a low resistance siliconized substrate, a laser diode mounted thereon and at least two H-F feeds, one of which is insulated from said siliconized substrate by a dielectric layer. According to the invention, the laser diode is laid on the siliconized substrate by means of a metallic assembly layer, and the H-F layer is moved away so as to be in the vincinity of the laser diode on the dielectric layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01S 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01S 5/022 (2006.01); H01S 5/02 (2006.01); H01S 5/042 (2006.01); H01S 5/062 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01S 5/022 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48091 (2013.01); H01S 5/0208 (2013.01); H01S 5/021 (2013.01); H01S 5/0224 (2013.01); H01S 5/02272 (2013.01); H01S 5/02276 (2013.01); H01S 5/042 (2013.01); H01S 5/0422 (2013.01); H01S 5/06226 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2224/48091 + H01L 2924/00014

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9852255A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19719853 A1 19981119; EP 0981842 A1 20000301; US 6456641 B1 20020924; WO 9852255 A1 19981119

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-19 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010817

2002-03-06 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010818

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010206

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991213

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE