Global Patent Index - EP 0981856 A1

EP 0981856 A1 2000-03-01 - DEVICE FOR ABSORBING ELECTRIC NOISE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ABSORBING ELECTRIC NOISE

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM ABSORBIEREN DES ELEKTRISCHEN RAUSCHENS

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION PERMETTANT D'ABSORBER LE BRUIT ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 0981856 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913249 A

Priority

  • DE 19811048 A
  • EP 9901562 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19811048A1] A casing comprises two half-shells (1,2), each containing a ferrite element for noise suppressing. In the clamped state the casing has a through aperture in each side wall (5) for an electric cable. The two ferrite elements have each a semi-cylindrical groove so that, with the casing closed, an enclosed, cylindrical passage for the electric cable is formed. Each half-shell contains a fastener for the ferrite element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/06 (2006.01); H03H 1/00 (2006.01); H05K 9/00 (2006.01); H01F 27/02 (2006.01); H01F 27/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/06 (2013.01); H01F 27/027 (2013.01); H01F 27/266 (2013.01); H01F 2017/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948198A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19811048 A1 19990923; AT 327590 T 20060615; AT 367012 T 20070815; AU 3144699 A 19991011; CA 2288774 A1 19990923; CA 2288774 C 20090818; CN 1258394 A 20000628; CN 1264275 C 20060712; DE 59913451 D1 20060629; DE 59914411 D1 20070823; DK 0981856 T3 20060619; DK 1689078 T3 20071112; EP 0981856 A1 20000301; EP 0981856 B1 20060524; EP 1689078 A1 20060809; EP 1689078 B1 20070711; ES 2267260 T3 20070301; ES 2289725 T3 20080201; HK 1026080 A1 20061027; HK 1093386 A1 20080104; JP 2001525128 A 20011204; JP 4312839 B2 20090812; MY 128937 A 20070330; NO 315069 B1 20030630; NO 995517 A 20000112; NO 995517 D0 19991111; PT 1689078 E 20070813; PT 981856 E 20060731; TR 9902791 T1 20000721; TW 508903 B 20021101; US 6400248 B1 20020604; WO 9948198 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WUERTH ELEKTRONIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070227

2007-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2267260

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-10-27 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: GR

- Ref Document Number: 1026080

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2006-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Effective date: 20060529

2006-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2006-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59913451

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-06-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-06-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-06-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-05-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2006-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2006-05-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030325

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000314

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE