Global Patent Index - EP 0981938 A1

EP 0981938 A1 2000-03-01 - An implement for spreading material

Title (en)

An implement for spreading material

Title (de)

Streuer

Title (fr)

Epandeur

Publication

EP 0981938 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202684 A

Priority

NL 1009950 A

Abstract (en)

An implement for spreading material comprises a frame (5) provided with a hopper (1, 2) for the material to be spread and a spreader member (3). The outside of the hopper (1, 2) is provided with a moulded edge (4), extending on all sides, for discharging water. A part of the moulded edge (4) can be connected to the frame (5). In this manner the hopper (1, 2) is supported by the frame (5) by means of the moulded edge (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01C 15/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0981938 A1 20000301; NL 1009950 C2 20000229

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021123

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020709

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI