Global Patent Index - EP 0981953 A3

EP 0981953 A3 2000-12-06 - Transgenic plants transformed with fumonisin detoxifying enzymes

Title (en)

Transgenic plants transformed with fumonisin detoxifying enzymes

Title (de)

Pflanzen die mit fumonisinentgiftenden Enzymen transformiert sind

Title (fr)

Plantes transformées par enzymes de detoxification de la fumonisine

Publication

EP 0981953 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99116039 A

Priority

  • EP 95931521 A
  • US 28959594 A
  • US 48481595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9606175A2] Methods for identifying organisms capable of degrading fumonisin. Fumonisin can be incorporated into culture medium for selection of organisms resistant to fumonisin and/or capable of growing on fumonisin as a sole carbon source. Using this method, several organisms have been identified. These organisms can be used to isolate the enzyme and the gene responsible for conferring fumonisin-resistance. The gene can be cloned and inserted into a suitable expression vector so that the protein can be further characterized. Additionally, the DNA encoding for fumonisin-resistance can be used to transform plant cells normally susceptible to Fusarium or other toxin-producing fungus infection. Plants can be regenerated from the transformed plant cells. In this way, a transgenic plant can be produced with the capability of degrading fumonisin, as well as with the capability of producing the degrading enzymes. Methods for detoxification in grain processing and in animal feed and rumen microbes are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/55; A01H 5/00; A01N 63/02; C12N 1/21; C12N 15/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A01N 63/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/16 (2006.01); C12N 9/18 (2006.01); C12N 15/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/55 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01); C12S 3/00 (2006.01); C12R 1/645 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 63/00 (2013.01); C12N 9/00 (2013.01); C12N 9/16 (2013.01); C12N 9/18 (2013.01); C12N 15/8209 (2013.01); C12N 15/8242 (2013.01); C12N 15/8282 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] R.F. VESONDER ET AL.;: "Comparative phytotoxicity of the fumonisins, AAL-toxin and yeast sphingolipids in Lemma minor L. (Duckweed)", ARCH. ENVIRON. CONTAM. TOXICOL., vol. 23, pages 464 - 467, XP002148637
  • [A] P.V. BÜNZ ET AL.;: "Purification of two isofunctional hydrolases (EC 3.7.1.8) in the degradative pathway for dibenzufuran in Sphingomonas sp. strain RW1", BIODEGRADATION, vol. 4, pages 171 - 178, XP002148638
  • [A] J.P. DUVICK ET AL.;: "Purification and characterization of a novel antimicrobial peptide from maize (Zea mays L.) kernels", J. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 267, pages 18814 - 18820, XP002148639

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9606175 A2 19960229; WO 9606175 A3 19960314; AT 196504 T 20001015; AU 3491095 A 19960314; AU 697831 B2 19981015; CA 2195784 A1 19960229; CA 2195784 C 20010227; DE 69518924 T2 20010118; DK 0775211 T3 20001113; EP 0775211 A1 19970528; EP 0775211 B1 20000920; EP 0981953 A2 20000301; EP 0981953 A3 20001206; ES 2151965 T3 20010116; GR 3035020 T3 20010330; JP 2001521362 A 20011106; MX 9701092 A 19980331; NZ 292668 A 19981125; PT 775211 E 20001229; US 5716820 A 19980210; US 5792931 A 19980811; ZA 9506531 B 19960325

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040402

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031121

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/55 A, 7A 01N 63/02 B, 7C 12N 15/82 B, 7A 01H 5/00 B, 7C 12N 1/21 B

2000-03-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 775211

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE