Global Patent Index - EP 0981977 A1

EP 0981977 A1 2000-03-01 - Locking of a pivoting leg, fixed under a table top

Title (en)

Locking of a pivoting leg, fixed under a table top

Title (de)

Arretierung für ein schwenkbar an einer Tischplatte befestigtes Tischbein

Title (fr)

Blocage d'un pied de table pivotant fixé à un plateau de table

Publication

EP 0981977 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113289 A

Priority

DE 29814597 U

Abstract (en)

The table has a hand lever (13) which releases the stop to allow the leg to swing into a plane parallel with the plane of the table top (1). The leg or a lateral pole (3) connecting to an opposing leg has a cam (7) which lies against a rigid stop (8) when the leg is swung out fully. The lever has a clamp wedge (9) which is supported on the table top. The wedge has a surface (10) on a side facing away from the stop which can be moved to be against the cam. The wedge is located along an edge surface (15) of a recess (6) in a base panel (5) which is firmly connected to the table top.

Abstract (de)

Eine Arretierung für ein schwenkbar an einer Tischplatte (1) befestigtes Tischbein (2) hat einen an der Tischplatte (1) um eine Achse (12) verschwenkbaren Handhebel (13) zum Lösen der Arretierung zwecks Verschwenken des Tischbeines (2) in eine Lage parallel zur Ebene der Tischplatte (1). Das Tischbein (2) oder ein dieses mit dem gegenüberliegenden Tischbein verbindendes Querrohr (3) weist einen bei ausgeschwenktem Tischbein (2) gegen einen Festanschlag (8) anliegenden Nocken (7) auf. Der Handhebel (13) hat einen an der Tischplatte (1) abgestützten Spannkeil (9), welcher eine gegen den Nocken (7) auf der dem Festanschlag (8) abgewandten Seite bewegbare Keilfläche (10) hat. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 3/08 (2013.01); A47B 3/0812 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0033 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29814597 U1 19981210; AT 259178 T 20040215; DE 19847731 A1 19990401; EP 0981977 A1 20000301; EP 0981977 B1 20040211

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090709

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080916

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NEULAND G.M.B.H. KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEME

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041112

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NEULAND G.M.B.H. KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEME

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-03-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908498 P 20040318

2004-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE IT LI NL

2004-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: RO

2004-02-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020808

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE IT LI NL

2000-11-15 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000817

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE IT LI NL

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI