Global Patent Index - EP 0981980 A1

EP 0981980 A1 2000-03-01 - Mobile device for storing skis

Title (en)

Mobile device for storing skis

Title (de)

Bewegbare Vorrichtung zum Lagern von Ski

Title (fr)

Dispositif mobile de rangement de skis

Publication

EP 0981980 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99410105 A

Priority

FR 9810930 A

Abstract (en)

The device includes a cart (12) having a metallic chassis (14) having retainers (16) for holding skis vertically. There are rollers (20) at the front part of the chassis, these rollers resting on the ground and fixed to a cross member (19). There are ball bearings (22) fixed to the second cross member (21) and cooperating with a guide rail (24) in the form of a monorail. The chassis has a beam (18) supporting ski retainers (16).

Abstract (fr)

Un dispositif de rangement de skis comprend un chariot mobile portant une pluralité de mâchoires de retenue pour le maintien en position verticale des skis. Des premiers moyens de roulement comportent des rouleaux prenant appui sur le sol et fixés à un premier longeron du châssis, chaque rouleau ayant un axe horizontal s'étendant perpendiculairement à la direction longitudinale. Des deuxièmes moyens de roulement sont formés par au moins un palier à billes 22 solidaire d'un deuxième longeron 21, et coopérant avec un rail de guidage disposé le long de la direction longitudinale de déplacement du chariot . <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 81/00; A47B 53/02; A63C 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 53/02 (2006.01); A47B 81/00 (2006.01); A63C 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 53/02 (2013.01); A47B 81/00 (2013.01); A63C 11/028 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0981980 A1 20000301; EP 0981980 B1 20031119; AT 254417 T 20031215; DE 69912900 D1 20031224; FR 2782618 A1 20000303; FR 2782618 B1 20001117

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130813

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120827

2013-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 254417 T

- Effective date: 20120827

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-03-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-02-20 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040220

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69912900 P 20031224

2003-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI

2003-11-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021104

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES IT LI

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI