Global Patent Index - EP 0981988 A2

EP 0981988 A2 2000-03-01 - Curtain suspension device

Title (en)

Curtain suspension device

Title (de)

Vorhangaufhängevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de suspension de rideau

Publication

EP 0981988 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810594 A

Priority

DE 29815226 U

Abstract (en)

Curtain is suspended from a guide rail (2) fastened to a building wall or ceiling by an arrangement of sliders (3), each having a head (4) which clips into a channel (15) in the side wall of the rail and a foot (5) for attaching the curtain. The slider can be removed from the rail by making the head smaller by pressure on the foot. Preferably, the head has two guide grooves (10, 11) in which the edges of the guide rail fit. It has a recess (9) extending horizontally at its centre to allow the head to be compressed.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorhangaufhängevorrichtung (1) weist eine an einer Gebäudewand oder -decke (13) zu befestigende Führungsschiene (2) auf, die einen sich in Längsrichtung erstreckenden Kanal (15) besitzt. In diesem Kanal (15) sind mehrere Gleiter (3) gleitverschieblich geführt, die jeweils einen Kopf (4) und einen Fuss (5) aufweisen und der Kopf (4) in den Kanal (15) eingerastet ist und der Fuss (5) zur Befestigung des Vorhanges dient. Der Kanal (15) ist in einer Seitenwand der Führungsschiene (2) angeordnet und zum Lösen des Gleiters (3) von der Führungsschiene (2) ist der Kopf (4) mittels des Fusses (5) verkleinerbar. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 13/00 (2006.01); A47H 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47H 15/04 (2013.01); A47H 13/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815226 U1 19981126; EP 0981988 A2 20000301; EP 0981988 A3 20010103; JP 2000070116 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031008

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: IT

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): IT

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI