Global Patent Index - EP 0981988 A3

EP 0981988 A3 2001-01-03 - Curtain suspension device

Title (en)

Curtain suspension device

Title (de)

Vorhangaufhängevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de suspension de rideau

Publication

EP 0981988 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810594 A

Priority

DE 29815226 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0981988A2] Curtain is suspended from a guide rail (2) fastened to a building wall or ceiling by an arrangement of sliders (3), each having a head (4) which clips into a channel (15) in the side wall of the rail and a foot (5) for attaching the curtain. The slider can be removed from the rail by making the head smaller by pressure on the foot. Preferably, the head has two guide grooves (10, 11) in which the edges of the guide rail fit. It has a recess (9) extending horizontally at its centre to allow the head to be compressed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 13/00 (2006.01); A47H 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47H 15/04 (2013.01); A47H 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815226 U1 19981126; EP 0981988 A2 20000301; EP 0981988 A3 20010103; JP 2000070116 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031008

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: IT

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): IT

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI