Global Patent Index - EP 0981991 A2

EP 0981991 A2 2000-03-01 - Bath and shower device with a bath-tub and associated shower partition

Title (en)

Bath and shower device with a bath-tub and associated shower partition

Title (de)

Bade- und Duscheinrichtungen mit einer Badewanne und einer zugeordneten Duschabtrennung

Title (fr)

Installation pour bain et douche comprenant une baignoire et une cloison correspondante pour la douche

Publication

EP 0981991 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113064 A

Priority

  • DE 3843510 A
  • DE 3843512 A
  • EP 93112928 A
  • EP 90900858 A

Abstract (en)

The shower partition comprises interconnected segments and is fixed collapsed against the wall from where it can be swivelled out. The partition comprises one or two structural units (11) which in the unfolded state form a closed shower cubicle with the wall on which they are fixed. In the case of two structural units (11) each comprises two or more segments (12). The units are fixed side by side on the wall (9) and in the unfolded state their free longitudinal sides (14) remote from the wall fixing abut each other to form the closed cubicle.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Duschabtrennung, die zwei separate Baueinheiten (11) umfaßt, von denen jede aus mindestens zwei schwenkbar miteinander verbundenen Trennelementen (12,13) besteht. Die Baueinheiten (11) sind mit jeweils einem Trennelement (12) nebeneinander im Abstand voneinander direkt an einer Raumwand (2) schwenkbar zu befestigen und bilden im aufgeklappten Zustand durch Aneinanderstoßen ihrer freien Seitenkanten (14) eine geschlossene Duschkabine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/00 (2006.01); A47K 3/02 (2006.01); A47K 3/20 (2006.01); A47K 3/36 (2006.01); A47K 4/00 (2006.01); A63C 5/03 (2006.01); E04H 1/12 (2006.01); E05D 15/32 (2006.01); A63C 10/08 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/03 (2013.01); A47K 3/36 (2013.01); A63C 5/0411 (2013.01); A63C 10/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9007294 A1 19900712; AT 112151 T 19941015; AT 187876 T 20000115; AU 4812890 A 19900801; BR 8907278 A 19910326; EP 0401350 A1 19901212; EP 0401350 B1 19940928; EP 0621002 A1 19941026; EP 0621002 B1 19991222; EP 0981991 A2 20000301; EP 0981991 A3 20010606; ES 2062503 T3 19941216; ES 2141742 T3 20000401; JP H02502345 A 19900802; JP H03503854 A 19910829; JP H0724634 B2 19950322; KR 960005700 B1 19960501; US 5274857 A 19940104; US 5337424 A 19940816

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050405

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-06-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47K 3/20 A, 7A 47K 3/36 B

2000-03-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 401350

2000-03-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 621002

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE