Global patent index - EP 0981992 A1

EP 0981992 A1 2000-03-01 - Multi-part structure for shower partition

Title (en)

Multi-part structure for shower partition

Title (de)

Mehrteilige anordnung von einer Duschabtrennung

Title (fr)

Structure en plusieurs parties pour séparation de douche

Publication

EP 0981992 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115170 A

Priority

DE 19838598 A

Abstract (en)

The partition comprises one or more each fixed (12) and hinging door-sections (14). In the installed position the hinges (16a,16b) are offset inwards towards the shower basin, so that the door- and foxed sections can overlap if desired, while also allowing installation of a door-section. The fixed section can be brought into two different positions in relation to the door by turning through 180[deg] on a horizontal axis and turning on a vertical axis. The hinges can be mounted on the fixed section at the top and bottom and offset from the doorway.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine mehrteilige Anordnung für eine Duschabtrennung (10) mit mindestens einem feststehenden Abschnitt (12), mindestens einem schwenkbaren Türabschnitt (14), und mit wenigstens zwei Schwenkeinrichtungen (16a,16b), die mit dem feststehenden Abschnitt (12) verbunden sind und über die der Türabschnitt (14) schwenkbar gehalten ist, wobei die Schwenkeinrichtungen in einem Einbauzustand des feststehenden Abschnitts (12) innen bzw. zur Duschtasse versetzt sind, ggf. so daß der Türabschnitt (14) mit dem feststehenden Abschnitt (12) überlappt, wobei die Schwenkeinrichtungen (16a,16b) so angeordnet sind, daß diese in einem anderen Einbauzustand gleichermaßen den Einbau eines Türabschnitts ermöglichen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0981992 A1 20000301; DE 19838598 A1 20000316; PL 335092 A1 20000228

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030624

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010406

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI