Global Patent Index - EP 0982049 A1

EP 0982049 A1 2000-03-01 - Improved face mask for self contained breathing apparatus

Title (en)

Improved face mask for self contained breathing apparatus

Title (de)

Verbesserte Gesichtsmaske für selbständiges Luftatemgerät

Title (fr)

Masque facial amélioré pour appareil respiratoire autonome

Publication

EP 0982049 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98402120 A

Priority

EP 98402120 A

Abstract (en)

A face mask for a self contained breathing apparatus has two pairs of straps fixed to the frame of the mask, the straps being fixed to a net or woven head piece (22). The straps at the top of the head piece are fixed with respect to the mask, and the bottom straps (24, 25) are adjustable to tighten the mask against the face of the user. The nose cup has ribs that receive legs of a mounting member for eyeglasses. The eyeglasses include frames, with support arms that are slidably fixable to the mounting member. The mounting member moves towards and away from the eyes of the user, and the support arms move up and down with respect to the nose cup, for full adjustability of the eyeglasses. The nose cup of the face mask is adjustable by either removing a portion at the chin and shortening the mask, or simply removing the portion to allow the user's chin to extend beyond the nose cup while still inside the face seal. The seal (12) for the mask has a single thickness in the forehead area for greater comfort while wearing a helmet, and is smaller at the temples for a tighter seal at the temples where users are frequently smaller. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 18/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/082 (2013.01); A62B 18/084 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982049 A1 20000301

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20100302

2008-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080317

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI