Global Patent Index - EP 0982086 A1

EP 0982086 A1 2000-03-01 - Device for widening an end portion of a pipe part

Title (en)

Device for widening an end portion of a pipe part

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Ausweiten eines Rohrendes

Title (fr)

Outil servant à élargir une extrémité de tuyau

Publication

EP 0982086 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202696 A

Priority

NL 1009923 A

Abstract (en)

A device for widening an end portion of a pipe part comprises a clamping member for clamping a pipe part to be widened on the outside, and a mandrel, directed towards the clamping member, for widening an end portion of a clamped pipe part. The clamping member and the mandrel are displaceable with respect to each other substantially in the axial direction of the mandrel. The device furthermore comprises a clamp-actuating mechanism for actuating the clamping member and a displacement mechanism for displacing the clamping member and the mandrel with respect to one another, which mechanisms are combined to form a single combined mechanism, and only one actuating member for actuating the combined mechanism. The combined mechanism is designed in such a manner that, when it is actuated in order to widen an end portion of a pipe part, the clamping member comes into action first, and then the mandrel and the clamping member move towards one another. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 41/02; B25B 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 41/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982086 A1 20000301; NL 1009923 C2 20000222; NL 1009923 C8 20021205

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020909

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI