Global Patent Index - EP 0982102 A3

EP 0982102 A3 2000-05-24 - Hand tool with illumination

Title (en)

Hand tool with illumination

Title (de)

Handwerkzeug mit Beleuchtung

Title (fr)

Outil avec illumination

Publication

EP 0982102 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99115148 A

Priority

DE 29815426 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19860918A1] The handheld tool includes a hollow handle (12) with a current source (14), at least one light source (16), a printed circuit board (18) in the handle which connects the current source and the light source, and a tool part (20) extending from the handle. The tool includes preferably an insulation (26) which extends from the handle, partially over the tool part. The hollow handle includes preferably a detachable cover (28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/18; F21V 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/18 (2006.01); F21V 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 33/0084 (2013.01); B25B 23/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815426 U1 19981217; DE 19860918 A1 20000316; DE 19860918 C2 20010208; EP 0982102 A2 20000301; EP 0982102 A3 20000524

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-26 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20001030

2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-05-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040211

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-10 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001030

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 25B 23/18 A, 7F 21V 33/00 B

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI