Global patent index - EP 0982103 A1

EP 0982103 A1 2000-03-01 - Automatic spindle locking mechanism

Title (en)

Automatic spindle locking mechanism

Title (de)

Automatische Spindelarretierung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage automatique pour une broche

Publication

EP 0982103 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98116378 A

Priority

EP 98116378 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JP2000071180A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To improve an automatic spindle damping device for a hand tool in order that it may simply be manufactured with a small number of parts, may hardly fail and may become resistant to wear. SOLUTION: This automatic spindle damping device has a latch part 50 connected against relative rotation to a spindle 20 or a housing 10 and connectable to at least one damping part 40, which is connected against relative rotation to the housing 10 or the spindle 20, in two directions or along and counter to the rotation of the spindle 20 and a drive part 34 coaxial with the spindle 20 and including a release element for disconnecting the latch part 50 and the damping part 40 from each other and for defining a control passage within the drive part 34. On rotation of the drive part 34, a control cam on the latch part 50 slides on the drive part 34 to cause axial shift of the latch part 50 and/or the damping part 40 to disconnect them from each other.

Abstract (de)

Eine automatische Spindelarretierung für Handwerkzeuge, insbesondere Bohrmaschinen, Bohrschrauber, Winkelschleifer und dergleichen mit einem drehfest mit der Spindel (20) oder dem Gehäuse (10) verbundenen Verriegelungsteil (50; 120), der in beiden Drehrichtungen der Spindel (20) mit wenigstens einem drehfest mit dem Gehäuse (10) bzw. der Spindel (20) verbundenen Arretierteil (40; 140) koppelbar ist und mit einem Antriebsteil (34; 110), der gleichachsig zur Spindel (20) angeordnet ist, und Entriegelungselemente aufweist, durch die das Verriegelungsteil (50; 120) und das Arretierteil (40; 140) entkoppelbar sind, ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Entriegelungselemente eine oder mehrere an dem Antriebsteil (34; 110) angeordnete Steuerbahnen (38; 116) sind, an denen einer oder mehrere Steuernocken (54; 124) des Verriegelungsteils (50; 120) durch eine Drehbewegung des Antriebsteils (34; 110)) derart gleiten, daß das Verriegelungsteil (50; 120) und das Arretierteil (40; 140) durch Axialverschiebung entweder des Verriegelungsteils (50; 120) und/oder des Arretierteils (40; 140) entkoppelbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25F 5/00; B23B 45/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/001 (2013.01); Y10T 408/95 (2013.01); Y10T 409/309352 (2013.01); Y10T 409/309408 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982103 A1 20000301; EP 0982103 B1 20010711; DE 59801010 D1 20010816; HK 1029305 A1 20020111; JP 2000071180 A 20000307; US 6213695 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status

2014-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59801010

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110828

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110828

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110828

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100823

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-07-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011012

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801010

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-08-16

2001-08-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-07-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-07-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-03-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: AUTOMATIC SPINDLE LOCKING MECHANISM

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI