Global patent index - EP 0982106 A1

EP 0982106 A1 2000-03-01 - Apparatus for removing the trimmed portions in a machine for cutting logs of paper and the like

Title (en)

Apparatus for removing the trimmed portions in a machine for cutting logs of paper and the like

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Entfernung von Abfallstücken in einer Maschine zum Schneiden von Papierrollen o. dgl

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'évacuation de déchets pour une machine pour le découpage de rouleaux de papier ou d'objets similaires

Publication

EP 0982106 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830506 A

Priority

EP 98830506 A

Abstract (en)

The apparatus is arranged on a transversal cutting machine, comprising means of cut and means of conveying the cut portions, for example rolls (2) or stacks obtained from logs (6) of a fixed length. The outlet means comprises a first conveyor (15) followed by a second conveyor (16). The first conveyor can displace from the outlet zone, by rotating or moving away after the passage of the last cut portion (2) of a log (6). In this way a first trimmed portion (3) falls down downstream of the cutting zone brought by the pusher (10) that can easily pass for turning back, and then a second trimmed portion falls down before that the first cut portion of the following log passes. Just after the passage of the second trimmed portion the first conveyor means (15) move back to such a position that allows regularly the transport of the cut portions (2). In this way it is possible also the use of pushers of large surface. The first conveyor means, preferably, moves away from the outlet zone after a rotation about a fixed hinge (19). Alternatively, they move to the side of the outlet zone. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/18 (2013.01); B26D 2210/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982106 A1 20000301; EP 0982106 B1 20040414; DE 69823185 D1 20040519; DE 69823185 T2 20050421

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150821

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080821

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080821

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070809

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69823185

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-04-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020225

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI