Global patent index - EP 0982108 A2

EP 0982108 A2 2000-03-01 - Process and device for making angular elements

Title (en)

Process and device for making angular elements

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung abgewinkelter Formkörper

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d'éléments d'angle

Publication

EP 0982108 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111203 A

Priority

DE 19838075 A

Abstract (en)

The wall cladding angled brick production method involves pressing a raw material strip (3) into an angled cross-section matching the finished bricks. The strip is conveyed (5) onto a support and fed through a separating cutter (14) for separating into brick blanks (15) which are dried and burned. An independent claim is also included for a machine for brick production.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von aus einer keramischen Grundmasse geformten und gebrannten, abgewinkelten Formkörpern, insbesondere von Winkelriemchen, wobei die Grundmasse mit einer ein geeignetes Mundstück (2) aufweisenden Strangpresse (1) zu einem abgewinkelten Formstrang (3) gepreßt wird, dessen Querschnitt (4) im wesentlichen dem des fertigen abgewinkelten Formkörpers entspricht. Anschließend wird der Formstrang (3) von einem Transportmittel (5) an der Unterseite des Formstrangs (3) durch entsprechend geformte Auflagen paßgerecht unterstützt aufgenommen und zu einer Trenneinrichtung (14) transportiert, wo vom Formstrang (3) Formkörperrohlinge (15) abgetrennt werden. Die Formkörperrohlinge (15) werden dann getrocknet und anschließend zu fertigen Formkörpern gebrannt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 3/20; B28B 11/08; B28B 11/16; B65G 49/08; E04F 13/08; E04F 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/20 (2006.01); B28B 11/08 (2006.01); B28B 11/16 (2006.01); B28B 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/16 (2013.01); B28B 3/20 (2013.01); B28B 11/08 (2013.01); B28B 13/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19838075 C1 19991014; EP 0982108 A2 20000301; EP 0982108 A3 20020123

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-11-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 28B 3/20 A, 7B 28B 15/00 B

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI