Global Patent Index - EP 0982124 A2

EP 0982124 A2 2000-03-01 - process for making letterpress plate by engraving using coherent electromagnetic radiation, and printing plate prepared therewith

Title (en)

process for making letterpress plate by engraving using coherent electromagnetic radiation, and printing plate prepared therewith

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hochdruckplatten durch Gravur-Aufzeichnung mittels kohärenter elektromagnetischer Strahlung und damit hergestellte Druckplatte

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une plaque d'impression en relief par gravure utilisant des rayons actiniques cohérents et plaque d'impression préparé l'utilisant

Publication

EP 0982124 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116468 A

Priority

DE 19838315 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JP2000168253A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To improve the resolution of a material for gravure recording by constituting a polymeric binder contained in a crosslinkable layer of polyvinyl alcohol of which the hydrolysis degree is set at % of a specified range and/or a structural unit represented by a specified formula, and setting the ceiling temperature of a polymeric filler at less than a specified numeral value. SOLUTION: A crosslinkable layer which is formed on a substrate, and constitutes a material to record a gravure by CO2 laser as a coherent electromagnetic radiation, is made to contain at least one kind of a polymeric binder constituted of at least one kind of an ethylene based unsaturated compound, a polymerization starter, and polyvinyl alcohol of which the hydrolysis degree is 50-99%, and/or a at least one kind of a copolymer having a structural unit represented by a specified structural formula of a specific proportion. In addition, by containing a polymeric filler having a ceiling temperature which is less than 800K, especially less than 600K (polystyrene, polymethylmethacrylate or polyvinyl chloride or the like), a material which is extremely optimum for a typographic printing plate enabling laser gravure can be obtained.

Abstract (de)

Ein Material für die Gravur-Aufzeichnung mittels kohärenter elektromagnetischer Strahlung für den Hochdruck, bestehend aus Träger, vernetzbarer Schicht, gegebenenfalls mit Deckschicht und/oder Deckfolie, wobei die Schicht mindestens eine ethylenisch ungesättigte Verbindung, einen Polymerisations-Initiator sowie wenigstens ein polymeres Bindemittel enthält, das aus Polyvinylalkohol und/oder wenigstens einem Copolymeren mit einem wesentlichen Anteil der Struktureinheit <IMAGE> besteht, enthält einen Füllstoft mit einer Ceiling-Temperatur kleiner als 800 K, insbesondere kleiner als 600 K, z.B. Polystyrol, Polymethylmethacrylat, Poly(ethylen)keton, Polyoxymethylen oder Poly(-methylstyrol), insbesondere mit Kugel- oder Etwa-Kugelform mit einer größten Abmessung von ca. 5-10 µm. Das Material ist für lasergravierbare Hochdruckplatten sehr geeignet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/021 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 1/02 (2006.01); B41N 1/12 (2006.01); B41N 1/22 (2006.01); G03F 7/027 (2006.01); G03F 7/033 (2006.01); G03F 7/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/05 (2013.01); Y10S 430/106 (2013.01); Y10S 430/11 (2013.01); Y10S 430/114 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982124 A2 20000301; EP 0982124 A3 20010926; EP 0982124 B1 20040421; DE 19838315 A1 20000302; JP 2000168253 A 20000620; US 6214521 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111125

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050821

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050821

2005-08-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050821

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040902

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040818

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040810

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909221

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOR MAKING LETTERPRESS PLATE BY ENGRAVING USING COHERENT ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION, AND PRINTING PLATE PREPARED T

2003-07-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOR MAKING LETTERPRESS PLATE BY ENGRAVING USING COHERENT ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION, AND PRINTING PLATE PREPARED T

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-06-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 41C 1/10 A, 7B 41C 1/05 B, 7B 41N 1/12 B

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI