Global Patent Index - EP 0982127 A1

EP 0982127 A1 2000-03-01 - Method and means for hot foil printing

Title (en)

Method and means for hot foil printing

Title (de)

Heissprägeverfahren und Heissprägevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la dorure à chaud

Publication

EP 0982127 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115787 A

Priority

DE 19838035 A

Abstract (en)

The hot embossing method uses a rotary machine (1) with an embossing device (2) having a pair of cooperating rollers (3,4) defining an embossing gap (5) through which a material web (7) and an embossing foil web (8) are fed, for periodic contact by a heated embossing matrix (6), incorporated in the surface of one of the rollers. A pre-heating device (24) in front of the embossing gap is used for pre- heating the material web to a temperature of between 80 and 120 degrees centigrade. An independent claim for a hot embossing device is also included.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer als Präge-Rotationsmaschine (1) ausgebildeten Heißprägevorrichtung mit einem Prägewerk (2), bei dem zwischen einem Zylinder (3) und einem Gegenzylinder (4) ein Prägespalt (5) gebildet ist, werden eine zu bedruckende Materiallage (7) und eine Prägefolienbahn (8) so bewegt, daß sie zumindest während eines Prägeintervalls geschwindigkeitsgleich durch den Prägespalt laufen. Eine beheizbare Prägematritze (6) dient als Kontaktwärmemittel zur Erwärmung der Materiallage und der Prägefolienbahn während des Prägeintervalles, bei dem auf der Prägefolienbahn befindliches Prägegut, wie holographische Abbildungen, unter Druck auf die Materiallage aufgeprägt wird. Eine dem Prägespalt vorgeschaltete Vorwärmeinrichtung (25) dient zur Vorerwärmung der zu beprägenden Materiallage vor Durchtritt durch den Prägespalt. Die Vorerwärmung führt zu einer besseren Haftung der aufgeprägten Einheiten auch bei Hochgeschwindigkeitsmaschinen mit hohem Materialdurchsatz. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 19/062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982127 A1 20000301

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-30 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020907

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020809

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE GB LI

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000819

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI