Global Patent Index - EP 0982214 A1

EP 0982214 A1 2000-03-01 - Curve dependent cross stop for limiting the transverse clearance between bodies and the running gear of railway vehicles

Title (en)

Curve dependent cross stop for limiting the transverse clearance between bodies and the running gear of railway vehicles

Title (de)

Bogenabhängiger Queranschlag für die Beschränkung des Querspiels zwischen Wagenkästen und Fahrwerken von Schienenfahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Butée transversale dépendante du déplacement angulaire pour limiter le jeu transversal entre les caisses et les trains de roulement des véhicules ferroviaires

Publication

EP 0982214 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113046 A

Priority

DE 19838321 A

Abstract (en)

The lateral stop consists of a roller and a contoured plate with fixed and elastic stops. The contour (8) of the elastic stop (6) is formed dependent upon that (9) of the fixed stop (5), so that lateral rigidity and lateral spring travel of the elastic stop are variable dependent upon the track curve. Lateral rigidity of the stop is defined by the shape of its base plate (7), while its lateral spring travel is varied dependent upon the differences between the contours of both stops.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen bogenabhängigen Queranschlag für die Beschränkung des Querspiels zwischen Wagenkästen und Fahrwerken von Schienenfahrzeugen, bestehend aus einer Rolle und einer Konturplatte, welche einerseits einen Festanschlag aufweist und andererseits mit einem elastischen Anschlag versehen ist, wobei die Rolle an dem Fahrwerk oder an dem Wagenkasten und die Konturplatte an dem jeweils anderen Fahrzeugteil angeordnet sein kann. Erfindungsgemäß wird das Problem der bogenabhängigen Ausführung von Federkonstante und Federweg dadurch gelöst, indem die Kontur (8) des elastischen Anschlags (6) in Abhängigkeit zur Kontur (9) des Festanschlages (5) derart ausgebildet ist, daß die Quersteifigkeit und der Querfederweg des elastischen Anschlags (6) in Abhängigkeit des Gleisbogens variabel ausführbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/22 (2006.01); B61F 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982214 A1 20000301; EP 0982214 B1 20040218; AT 259730 T 20040315; CZ 292818 B6 20031217; CZ 9902529 A3 20000315; DE 19838321 A1 20000302; DE 19838321 C2 20030528

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908560

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130703

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130703

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 259730 T

- Effective date: 20130703

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120806

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH

- Free text: DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH#KABLOWER WEG 89#12526 BERLIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH#KABLOWER WEG 89#12526 BERLIN (DE)

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908560 P 20040325

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI