Global Patent Index - EP 0982216 A2

EP 0982216 A2 2000-03-01 - Rail vehicle emergency braking system

Title (en)

Rail vehicle emergency braking system

Title (de)

Notbremssystem für Schienenfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Système de freinage de secours pour véhicule ferroviaire

Publication

EP 0982216 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99306478 A

Priority

GB 9818508 A

Abstract (en)

A rail vehicle braking system comprises a brake (4) mounted on a rail vehicle by mounting apparatus, the mounting apparatus providing for movement of the brake between a first position, in which the brake is a desired distance above a rail on which the said vehicle is mounted, and a second position, in which the brake engages with the rail to generate a braking force. Movement of the brake from the first to the second position is caused by electromagnetic attraction between the brake and the rail. The mounting apparatus comprises a piston and cylinder arrangement (11, 13, 18, 19, 24) secured between the vehicle and the brake, the piston and cylinder arrangement comprising biasing means (22) to lift the brake into the said first position and supply means (31-33) to introduce hydraulic fluid into the cylinder or to remove hydraulic fluid from the cylinder, whereby the first position of the brake may be adjusted. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61H 7/08; B60T 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61H 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61H 7/086 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982216 A2 20000301; EP 0982216 A3 20020710; EP 0982216 B1 20040324; GB 9818508 D0 19981021

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-06-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-06-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040621

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): GB

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-05-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): GB

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI