Global Patent Index - EP 0982224 A2

EP 0982224 A2 2000-03-01 - Vehicle head-lamp, particularly for a moped

Title (en)

Vehicle head-lamp, particularly for a moped

Title (de)

Fahrzeug-Scheinwerfer, insbesondere für ein Moped

Title (fr)

Projecteur de véhicule, notamment pour un cyclomoteur

Publication

EP 0982224 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99830454 A

Priority

IT TO980725 A

Abstract (en)

A vehicle head-lamp, particularly for mopeds, comprises a reflector including an upper portion (13s) and a lower portion (13i) defining separated ellipsoidal surfaces, having separated foci. The light source (S) associated with the head-lamp extends from one focus (Fi) of the lower portion (13i) of the reflector to a point intermediate between said focus and a focus (Fs) of the upper portion (13s) of the reflector. At the front of the head-lamp there is provided an aspherical diverging lens (17) having an outer face with a plurality of cylindrical micro-lenses (22), for deviating downwardly the light rays directed above the horizon line passing through the optical axis of the head-lamp. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B62J 6/02; F21V 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 5/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/137 (2013.01); F21S 48/1258 (2013.01); F21S 48/1283 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982224 A2 20000301; EP 0982224 A3 20011017; IT 1303544 B1 20001114; IT TO980725 A1 20000228; IT TO980725 D0 19980828

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI