Global Patent Index - EP 0982233 A1

EP 0982233 A1 2000-03-01 - Stackable and nestable container

Title (en)

Stackable and nestable container

Title (de)

Ineinandersetzbarer und stapelbarer Behälter

Title (fr)

Récipient gerbable et emboîtable

Publication

EP 0982233 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202721 A

Priority

NL 1009922 A

Abstract (en)

Transport means for individual products comprising a series of at least substantially identical shelves (10,20,30,40) placed one above another so as to receive the products thereon. The shelves are provided with stacking members (51-54) which each comprise a hollow body open on at least one side (70) and extend at least practically perpendicularly from the shelf. The stacking members (51-54) are able to receive therein at least practically the greater part of a similar stacking member (51-54) of a further shelf. The shelves further comprise support zones (61-64) which are intended to allow the stacking members of a following shelf to support at that position. A stacking member (51-54) and a support zone (61-64) associated therewith always lie rotated at least practically 180 DEG relative to each other round an imaginary central normal line of the shelf. With an identical orientation of the shelves (10,20,30,40) the shelves will hereby fall into each other to form an extremely compact stack. When on the other hand the shelves are alternately rotated 180 DEG relative to each other, a stack will be obtained wherein the shelves maintain a certain mutual pitch which is substantially determined by the length of the stacking members. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982233 A1 20000301; NL 1009922 C2 20000222

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021005

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020524

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-11-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI