Global patent index - EP 0982238 A1

EP 0982238 A1 2000-03-01 - Bulk bag for highly dispersed,air-containing solids and method for filling

Title (en)

Bulk bag for highly dispersed,air-containing solids and method for filling

Title (de)

Grossgebinde für hochdisperse, hochlufthaltige Feststoffe und ein Verfahren zu deren Befüllung

Title (fr)

Conteneur souple pour des produits solides hautement dispersés et aérés et procédé pour le remplissage du produit

Publication

EP 0982238 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115071 A

Priority

DE 19839106 A

Abstract (en)

The large flexible container consists of at least two layers on top of one another. The inner layer (8) is an uncoated fabric letting through air, while the outer layer (9) is provided with a dust-tight, moisture blocking coating. The two layers are joined to one another by means of special outlets (10) in such a way that air removal from the container can take place only through these outlets.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung sind Großgebinde für hochdisperse, hochlufthaltige Feststoffe zur mehrmaligen Befüllung und Entleerung durch Vakuumabfüllanlagen und ein Verfahren zu deren Befüllung. Die Gebinde bestehen dabei aus mindestens zwei übereinander liegenden Lagen (8,9), wobei eine innere Lage (8) aus unbeschichteten, luftdurchlässigem Gewebe besteht, eine äußere Lage (9) staubdicht und feuchtesperrend beschichtet ist und diese Lagen durch eine spezielle Nahtausführung (10) so miteinander verbunden sind, daß die Entlüftung des Gebindes nur durch diese möglich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 88/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/01 (2006.01); B65B 1/28 (2006.01); B65D 88/16 (2006.01); B65D 88/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/1618 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982238 A1 20000301; EP 0982238 B1 20011107; DE 19839106 A1 20000309; JP 2000072154 A 20000307; JP 3325862 B2 20020917; US 6199602 B1 20010313

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-08-24 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20050225

2002-09-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DEGUSSA AG

- Effective date: 20020716

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020114

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900398

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-13

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE GB

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990805

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI