Global Patent Index - EP 0982240 A1

EP 0982240 A1 2000-03-01 - Locking arrangement in a refuse collection vehicle

Title (en)

Locking arrangement in a refuse collection vehicle

Title (de)

Verriegelungsanordnung in einem Müllsammelfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage dans un véhicule de ramassage d'ordures

Publication

EP 0982240 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99850130 A

Priority

SE 9802884 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to an arrangement in load-carrying vehicles (1) comprising a loading space (2) defining an opening that can be closed off substantially completely by a hood (3), a power device (5) for opening and closing the hood (3) and a locking device (11,13) arranged for sealed locking of the hood (3) against said space (2). The invention is characterised in that the locking device (11,13) comprises a substantially vertically arranged and displaceable element (11) which is arranged in the loading space (2), and a locking clamp (13) arranged in the hood (3), said power device (5) being adapted to displace said element (11) through said locking clamp (13) when locking the hood (3). By means of the invention, a locking device is provided, especially suitable for locking a tailgate (3) against a refuse container (2) of a refuse collection vehicle (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3521276 A1 19861218 - SAEKKIVAELINE OY [FI]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982240 A1 20000301; NO 994158 A 20000229; NO 994158 D0 19990827; SE 512557 C2 20000403; SE 9802884 D0 19980828; SE 9802884 L 20000229

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020307

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010827

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI