Global Patent Index - EP 0982252 A1

EP 0982252 A1 2000-03-01 - Method for automatic splicing of two strips of packaging material

Title (en)

Method for automatic splicing of two strips of packaging material

Title (de)

Verfahren zum automatischen Verbinden von zwei Bahnen aus Verpackungsmaterial

Title (fr)

Procédé de raccordement automatique de deux bandes de matériau d'emballage

Publication

EP 0982252 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115358 A

Priority

DE 19838545 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JP2000063013A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide a method and a device for automatically detecting print marks marked on a web material at regular intervals. SOLUTION: Even if different print patterns 40, 41, 42 are printed in succession among print marks 37, 38, 39 and on a moving route of the print marks 37, 38, 39, since both width 43 of the print part and the interval among the print parts (37, 38, 39) were preset in advance, as far as both width and interval coincide substantially with the preset value, the print part can be detected as the print mark.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum automatischen Erkennen von Druckmarken (37,38,39), die in regelmäßigen Abständen auf Materialbahnen (36) aufgebracht sind. Der Erfindung liegt das Problem zugrunde, das Erkennen von Druckmarken zu verbessern, wenn zwischen den Druckmarken in derselben Bewegungsbahn wie die Druckmarken Fremddrucke (40,41,42) aufgebracht sind. Gelöst wird dieses Problem dadurch, daß die Breiten (43) von Aufdrucken sowie die Abstände (44) zwischen Aufdrucken ermittelt werden und wenn Breite und Abstand mit vorbestimmten Werten im wesentlichen übereinstimmen, ein Aufdruck als Druckmarke erkannt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/18 (2006.01); B65H 23/04 (2006.01); B65H 23/182 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/046 (2013.01); B65H 2511/413 (2013.01); B65H 2511/512 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/413 + B65H 2220/02
  2. B65H 2511/512 + B65H 2220/01

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982252 A1 20000301; EP 0982252 B1 20050302; BR 9904152 A 20000829; CN 1153170 C 20040609; CN 1249485 A 20000405; DE 19838545 A1 20000302; JP 2000063013 A 20000229; US 6603887 B1 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59911681

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59911681

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130829

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110804

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110804

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110804

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100811

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100814

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-04-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911681 P 20050407

2005-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2004-09-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC SPLICING OF TWO STRIPS OF PACKAGING MATERIAL

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021008

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-11-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI