Global Patent Index - EP 0982253 A1

EP 0982253 A1 2000-03-01 - Device for processing flexible and flat products

Title (en)

Device for processing flexible and flat products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verarbeiten von flexiblen, flächigen Erzeugnissen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour traiter des produits flexibles et plats

Publication

EP 0982253 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113397 A

Priority

CH 172498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2280544A1] An apparatus (10) for conveying flexible sheet-like products wherein a plurality of conveying elements (12) are arranged one behind the other on a rotatable support member in a circular array, and each conveying element comprises a roller segment (24), which is driven continuously in the direction of rotation (D), and a mating element (26), which interacts with the roller segment. In the product receiving region (14), a recess section (44) of the respective roller segment (24) forms, with the mating element (26), an introduction gap (48), of which the leading end is closed. The forward position of the recess section (44) forms a stop (62) for engaging the leading edge (52) of the fed product (19). At about the same time as the leading edge (52) comes into contact with the stop (62), a lateral-surface section (46) following the recess section (44) forms, together with the mating element (26), a conveying gap (54) in which the product (19) is retained in order to be transported further through the conveying element (12).

Abstract (de)

Die Fördereinrichtung (10) weist hintereinander angeordnete Förderelemente (12) auf. Diese bestehen aus einem in Drehrichtung (D) kontinuierlich angetriebenen Walzensegment (24) und einem mit diesem zusammenwirkenden Gegenelement (26). Im Übernahmebereich (14) bildet der Rückenabschnitt (44) des jeweiligen Walzensegments (24) mit dem Gegenelement (26) einen Einführspalt (48), dessen vorauslaufendes Ende geschlossen ist. Dort bildet der Rückenabschnitt (44) einen Anschlag (62) für die vorauslaufende Kante (52) des zugeführten Erzeugnisses (19). Wenigstens annähernd gleichzeitig mit der Berührung des Anschlags (62) durch die vorauslaufende Kante (52), bildet der dem Rückenabschnitt (44) nachfolgende Mantelflächenabschnitt (46) zusammen mit dem Gegenelement (26) einen Führungsspalt (48), in welchem das Erzeugnis (19) zum Weitertransport durch das Förderelement (12) hindurch, gehalten ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/06 (2006.01); B65H 29/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/40 (2006.01); B65H 29/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/68 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44712 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44732 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4474 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1119 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1521 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1532 (2013.01); B65H 2404/262 (2013.01); B65H 2404/2693 (2013.01); B65H 2404/654 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2301/44712 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2301/44732 + B65H 2220/02
  3. B65H 2301/4474 + B65H 2220/02
  4. B65H 2301/4474 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (applicant)

EP 0638503 A1 19950215 - HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982253 A1 20000301; EP 0982253 B1 20020925; CA 2280544 A1 20000221; CA 2280544 C 20060711; DE 59902823 D1 20021031; JP 2000063021 A 20000229; JP 4414025 B2 20100210; RU 2226493 C2 20040410; US 6220591 B1 20010424

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130712

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59902823

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121003

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100712

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090713

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100712

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080714

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-01-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902823

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-31

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020319

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000327

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI