Global patent index - EP 0982258 A1

EP 0982258 A1 2000-03-01 - Apparatus for generating shaft information for an elevator installation

Title (en)

Apparatus for generating shaft information for an elevator installation

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Erzeugung von Schachtinformation einer Aufzugsanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour générer des informations de cage dans une installation d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 0982258 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116020 A

Priority

  • EP 99116020 A
  • EP 98810822 A

Abstract (en)

The information generation device uses source elements (10,12), e.g. magnets, positioned within the elevator shaft (3) at the rear of the frame (4) for the elevator access door on each floor, cooperating with switched sources, e.g. magnetic switches, at the rear of the frame for the elevator cabin door, upon passage of the elevator cabin.

Abstract (de)

Bei dieser Einrichtung zur Erzeugung von Schachtinformation sind Geberelemente (10, 12) eines Aufzugschachtes (3) am Rückteil (7) einer Zarge (4) einer Stockwerktür (2) angeordnet. Mittels der Geberelemente (10, 12) schaltbare Geber sind am Rückteil einer Zarge einer Kabinentür angeordnet. Mit der Anordnung der Geberelemente bzw. Geber an bestehenden Bauteilen können Montagezeit und Kosten wesentlich vermindert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 1/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/36 (2006.01); B66B 1/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982258 A1 20000301; EP 0982258 B1 20031217; AT 256626 T 20040115; CA 2280429 A1 20000221; CA 2280429 C 20071023; CN 1147416 C 20040428; CN 1247830 A 20000322; DE 59908076 D1 20040129; DK 0982258 T3 20040308; ES 2212838 T3 20040801; JP 2000203772 A 20000725; PT 982258 E 20040531; US 2002014373 A1 20020207; US 6386327 B2 20020514

INPADOC legal status

2015-03-31 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2014-12-30 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20031217

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20031217

2014-10-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MA03

- Ref Document Number: 256626

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20131015

2014-09-04 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: R107

- Ref Document Number: 59908076

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140904

2014-08-01 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: MP4A

- Effective date: 20140730

2014-07-30 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20131015

2014-07-30 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Effective date: 20131015

2014-07-15 [REG CH PLX] PATENT DECLARED INVALID FROM DATE OF GRANT ONWARDS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLX

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130815

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130829

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130830

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130813

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130214

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130813

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-15 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R064

- Ref Document Number: 59908076

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-10-15 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: R103

- Ref Document Number: 59908076

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2005-01-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

2004-11-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040814

2004-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2212838

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040316

2004-04-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-03-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-02-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908076

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021002

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI