Global patent index - EP 0982260 A1

EP 0982260 A1 2000-03-01 - Device for minimising air noise on a high speed elevator car

Title (en)

Device for minimising air noise on a high speed elevator car

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Verminderung von Windgeräuschen an schnelllaufenden Aufzugskabinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour minimiser les bruits d'air sur une cabine d'ascenseur à haute vitesse

Publication

EP 0982260 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115668 A

Priority

  • EP 99115668 A
  • EP 98810787 A

Abstract (en)

An ellipsoidal top mounting element (3) is mounted on the top of the cabin (1) and a preferably frame-like bottom mounting element (4) is mounted on the bottom side. A lifting mechanism is provided for the top mounting element. The top mounting element is loosely secured to the cabin roof. The bottom mounting element is a hollow body. The lifting mechanism comprises a manually and/or mechanically operated system of a winch, cable and guide rolls.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Einrichtung zur Verminderung von Windgeräuschen und Vibrationen an schnelllaufenden Aufzugskabinen (1), bestehend aus anbaubaren aerodynamischen Elementen (3, 4) und einer Vorrichtung für die Zugänglichkeit zum Kabinendach. Das obere ellipsoidähnliche Anbauelement (3) wird auf der Aufzugskabine (1) lose abgestellt und mittels einer Zentriereinrichtung formschlüssig gehalten. Seitliche Einbuchtungen umschliessen die Führungsrollenträger (6). Als Vorrichtung für die Zugänglichkeit zum Kabinendach ist eine eingebaute Hebevorrichtung vorgesehen, welche das Anheben des oberen Anbauelementes (3) ermöglicht. Das untere Anbauelement (4) ist als rahmenförmiger Hohlkörper ausgebildet und weist an seiner Unterseite abklappbare Deckel auf, welche den Zugang zu den Armaturen an der Unterseite der Aufzugskabine (1) ermöglichen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0226 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 097, no. 008 29 August 1997 (1997-08-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 095, no. 001 28 February 1995 (1995-02-28)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 132 (M - 1229) 3 April 1992 (1992-04-03)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982260 A1 20000301

INPADOC legal status

2007-03-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1026681

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030301

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI