Global Patent Index - EP 0982262 A1

EP 0982262 A1 2000-03-01 - Industrial truck with liftable operator's compartment and method for operating the industrial truck

Title (en)

Industrial truck with liftable operator's compartment and method for operating the industrial truck

Title (de)

Flurförderzeug mit anhebbarem Fahrerstand und Verfahren zum Betreiben des Flurförderzeugs

Title (fr)

Chariot de manutention avec poste de conduite soulevable et procédé pour faire fonctionner le chariot de manutention

Publication

EP 0982262 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116240 A

Priority

DE 19839234 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6345694B1] An industrial truck with a forward propulsion unit for horizontal movement of the industrial truck, a driver's platform that can be raised or lowered by a vertical propulsion unit, at least one control device to control the vertical propulsion unit and the forward propulsion unit, and at least one blocking device that can be adjusted as necessary to close or open an entrance to the driver's platform. The control device is switched so that, depending on the level of the driver's platform and the position of the blocking device, either all the functions of the forward propulsion unit and of the vertical propulsion unit are enabled, or all the functions of the forward propulsion unit and of the vertical propulsion unit are disabled, or a raising of the driver's platform is disabled, while a lowering of the driver's platform and/or a horizontal movement of the industrial truck is possible. The control device is advantageously switched so that during a raising of the driver's platform with an open blocking device, as soon as a specified height is reached, any further raising of the driver's platform is prevented, although a lowering of the driver's platform and/or a horizontal movement of the industrial truck are still possible.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Flurförderzeug mit einer Fahrantriebseinheit zum horizontalen Bewegen des Flurförderzeugs, einem mittels einer Vertikalantriebseinheit anhebbaren oder absenkbaren Fahrerstand (6), mindestens einer Steuervorrichtung zum Steuern der Vertikalantriebseinheit und der Fahrantriebseinheit, sowie einer zum Versperren oder Freigeben eines Zugangs zu dem Fahrerstand (6) willkürlich verstellbaren Absperrvorrichtung (9). Erfindungsgemäß ist die Steuervorrichtung derart geschaltet, daß in Abhängigkeit von der Hubhöhe des Fahrerstands (6) und der Stellung der Absperrvorrichtung (9) entweder alle Funktionen der Fahrantriebseinheit und der Vertikalantriebseinheit ermöglicht sind, oder alle Funktionen der Fahrantriebseinheit und der Vertikalantriebseinheit verhindert sind, oder ein Anheben des Fahrerstands (6) verhindert ist, hingegen ein Absenken des Fahrerstand (6) und/oder ein horizontales Bewegen des Flurförderzeugs ermöglicht ist. Vorteilhafterweise ist die Steuervorrichtung derart geschaltet, daß während eines Anhebens des Fahrerstands (6) mit geöffneter Absperrvorrichtung (9), sobald eine vorgegebene Hubhöhe (H) erreicht ist, ein weiteres Anheben des Fahrerstands (6) verhindert ist, hingegen ein Absenken des Fahrerstands (6) und/oder ein horizontales Bewegen des Flurförderzeugs ermöglicht ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/075

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/075 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/07545 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982262 A1 20000301; EP 0982262 B1 20031015; DE 19839234 A1 20000309; US 6345694 B1 20020212

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080817

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080817

2009-04-29 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20081127

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080817

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070808

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: STILL WAGNER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070829

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070815

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070809

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060816

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060808

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-08-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050818

2004-09-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-09-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: JUNGHEINRICH MOOSBURG GMBH

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-08-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040806

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-01-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907354

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI