Global patent index - EP 0982389 A1

EP 0982389 A1 2000-03-01 - Process and apparatus for producing combustible gas

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for producing combustible gas

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Brenngas

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la production de gaz combustible

Publication

EP 0982389 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98116302 A

Priority

EP 98116302 A

Abstract (en)

The process comprises passing the volatile prolyzed product into a free chamber reactor (10), gasifying the prolyzed product in the chamber reactor (10) and using a heat of reaction to gasify the volatile prolyzed product. In the production of fuel gas from industrial waste, tires and plastic waste, waste hermetically sealed is prolyzed in a prolyzing device and the portion of volatile prolyzed from the prolyzed product is gasified by means of air or oxygen-enriched air during formation of fuel gas. An independent claim is included for an assembly to carry out the production.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Herstellung von Brenngas aus Haus- und Industriemüll, Altreifen, Kunststoffabfällen, Farb- und Lackschlämmen, Autoleichtshredder und dergleichen wird der Müll unter Luftabschluß in einer Pyrolyseeinrichtung pyrolisiert. Der bei der Pyrolyse entstehende flüchtige Anteil der Pyrolyseprodukte wird unter Zugabe von Luft oder von mit Sauerstoff angereicherter Luft unter Bildung des Brenngases vergast. Die flüchtigen Pyrolyseprodukte werden mittels Unterdruck in einen Freiraumreaktor eingeleitet. Die Vergasung der flüchtigen Pyrolyseprodukte wird in dem Freiraumreaktor durchgeführt. Zur Vergasung der flüchtigen Pyrolyseprodukte wird deren eigene Reaktionswärme verwendet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10J 3/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10B 53/07 (2006.01); C10J 1/00 (2006.01); C10J 3/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/66 (2013.01); C10J 3/485 (2013.01); C10J 3/526 (2013.01); C10J 2200/158 (2013.01); C10J 2300/0946 (2013.01); C10J 2300/0956 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1223 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1884 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982389 A1 20000301; CA 2281131 A1 20000228; JP 2000080375 A 20000321; KR 20000017431 A 20000325

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001115

2001-02-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2001-01-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR LI

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI