Global Patent Index - EP 0982407 A1

EP 0982407 A1 2000-03-01 - Process for melting inorganic substances

Title (en)

Process for melting inorganic substances

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Schmelzen von anorganischen Stoffen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fusion de substances inorganiques

Publication

EP 0982407 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810835 A

Priority

EP 98810835 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JP2000154387A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To reduce the energy expense and facility expense by improving a method for melting inorganic substance. SOLUTION: Fuel and oxygen or a gas enriched in oxygen and an inorganic substance are fed to a liquid bath and a solid fuel is fed in a form of a single product thereto in order to melt the inorganic substance. Oxygen or a gas enriched in oxygen is jetted onto the surface of the liquid bath by a nozzle and reacted with the solid fuel while releasing heat. According to this method, high temperature can be attained by using a fuel which is preferable in cost.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Schmelzen von anorganischen Stoffen (7) in einem drehenden liegenden Konverter oder einem Drehrohr (1) mittels Zugabe von Brennstoff (8), Sauerstoff oder sauerstoffangereicherten Gasen (10) und der anorganischen Stoffe (7) in ein flüssiges Bad (5) wird fester Brennstoff (8) in stückiger Form zugegeben. Der Sauerstoff oder das sauerstoffangereicherte Gas (10) wird mit hoher Geschwindigkeit (v) auf die Oberfläche des Bades (5) aufgedüst, reagiert mit dem festen Brennstoff (8) und dabei wird Wärme freigesetzt. Mit dem erfindungsgemässen Verfahren können bei Einsatz kostengünstiger Brennstoffe hohe Temperaturen erreicht werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 5/42; F27B 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 1/10 (2006.01); C21B 11/08 (2006.01); C21B 13/08 (2006.01); C21C 5/28 (2006.01); C21C 5/42 (2006.01); C22B 7/00 (2006.01); F23G 5/027 (2006.01); F23G 5/14 (2006.01); F23J 1/00 (2006.01); F27B 3/06 (2006.01); F27B 3/22 (2006.01); F27B 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 13/085 (2013.01); C21C 5/42 (2013.01); F27B 3/06 (2013.01); F27B 3/225 (2013.01); F27B 7/2083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 4272286 A 19810609 - SCHEMPP EBERHARD G
  • [Y] US 3934864 A 19760127 - MORLET JEAN GEORGES MARIE
  • [A] AU 543552 B2 19850426 - SUMITOMO METAL IND
  • [Y] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 8747, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M24, AN 87-192458, XP002091699
  • [Y] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 8742, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M24, AN 87-297427, XP002091700

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982407 A1 20000301; EP 0982407 B1 20030122; AT 231560 T 20030215; DE 59807017 D1 20030227; JP 2000154387 A 20000606; KR 20000017396 A 20000325; NO 994086 A 20000225; NO 994086 D0 19990824; TW 548332 B 20030821; US 6432162 B1 20020813

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030831

2004-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-12-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030824

2003-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-23 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-04-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-04-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-04-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MARTIN GMBH FUER UMWELT-

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2003-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807017

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MARTIN GMBH FUER UMWELT-UND ENERGIETECHNIK

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-01-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-12-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010629

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI