Global patent index - EP 0982409 A2

EP 0982409 A2 2000-03-01 - Process for preparing articles from rhodium powder and articles prepared thereby

Title (en)

Process for preparing articles from rhodium powder and articles prepared thereby

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Formkörpers aus Rhodium-Pulver sowie aus Rhodium-Pulver hergestellter Formkörper

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation d'articles à partir de poudre de rhodium et articles ainsi préparés

Publication

EP 0982409 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98120884 A

Priority

DE 19838888 A

Abstract (en)

In the process, rhodium is molded into a powder under pressure of at least 400 Mpa and is heat-treated under a pressure of 1 mbar to 1 bar at a temperature of at least 1300 degrees C, preferably at least 1500 degree C or more preferably 1700 degree C. An independent claim includes a shaped-body, e.g. clock case, composed of rhodium.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Formkörpers aus Rhodium wird das Rhodium in Pulverform unter einem Druck von mindestens 400 Mpa in einer Form gepreßt. Unter einem Druck von einem Millibar bis einem bar wird der Formkörper bei einer Temperatur von mindestens 1300 Grad Celsius, vorzugsweise mindestens 1500 Grad Celsius, insbesondere mindestens 1700 Grad Celsius wärmebehandelt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/0466 (2013.01); B22F 2998/10 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 3/02 + B22F 3/1007 + B22F 3/15
  2. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 3/1007 + B22F 2201/11
  3. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 3/1007 + B22F 2201/10

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982409 A2 20000301; EP 0982409 A3 20020828; DE 19838888 A1 20000309; DE 19838888 C2 20010719

INPADOC legal status

2003-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI