Global Patent Index - EP 0982410 A1

EP 0982410 A1 2000-03-01 - Aluminium alloy with good machinability

Title (en)

Aluminium alloy with good machinability

Title (de)

Aluminiumlegierung mit guter Spanbarkeit

Title (fr)

Alliage d'aluminium à bonne usinabilité

Publication

EP 0982410 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121526 A

Priority

  • CZ 262896 A
  • EP 97810609 A

Abstract (en)

Aluminum alloy contains (in wt.%) 4.6-6.0 copper, 0.2-1.0 bismuth, 0.2-0.7 tin, maximum 0,45 zinc, maximum 0.7 iron, maximum 0.4 silicon, and maximum 0.15 impurities.

Abstract (de)

Eine Aluminiumlegierung mit guter Spanbarkeit enthält in Gew.-% Kupfer, 4,6 bis 6,0; Wismut, 0,2 bis 1,0; Zinn, 0,2 bis 0,7; Zink, max. 0,45; Eisen, max. 0,7; Silizium, max. 0,4 sowie unvermeidbare Verunreinigungen einzeln max. 0,05, insgesamt max. 0,15 und Aluminuium als Rest. Durch die kombinierte Anwendung von Zinn und Wismut kann auf einen gesundheitsschädlichen Zusatz von Blei verzichtet werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/12; C22C 21/14; C22C 21/18; C22F 1/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/00 (2006.01); C22C 21/02 (2006.01); C22C 21/08 (2006.01); C22C 21/12 (2006.01); C22C 21/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/08 (2013.01); C22C 21/003 (2013.01); C22C 21/02 (2013.01); C22C 21/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9613617 A1 19960509 - REYNOLDS METALS CO [US]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 11 26 December 1995 (1995-12-26)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 280 (C - 0729) 18 June 1990 (1990-06-18)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 173 (C - 0828) 2 May 1991 (1991-05-02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0828008 A2 19980311; EP 0828008 A3 19981111; EP 0828008 B1 20000705; AT 194393 T 20000715; CZ 286150 B6 20000112; CZ 9602628 A3 19990512; DE 59701965 D1 20000810; EP 0982410 A1 20000301; HU 9701466 A2 19990628; HU 9701466 A3 20020328; HU 9701466 D0 19971128; PL 183835 B1 20020731; PL 321947 A1 19980316; SI 9700232 A 19980430

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020716

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-03-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ALUMINIUM ALLOY WITH GOOD MACHINABILITY

2000-03-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 828008

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI