Global Patent Index - EP 0982418 A2

EP 0982418 A2 2000-03-01 - Apparatus and method for stufferbox crimping a synthetic yarn

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for stufferbox crimping a synthetic yarn

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Stauchkräuseln eines synthetischen Fadens

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour le frisage à boîte de bourrage d'un fil synthétique

Publication

EP 0982418 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116107 A

Priority

DE 19838896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6141843A] An apparatus and a method of stuffer box crimping a synthetic multifilament yarn, wherein the yarn is advanced in a conveying nozzle by means of a heated conveying gas into a stuffer box and compressed to a yarn plug. At the outlet of the stuffer box, a pair of rolls form a conveying gap for advancing the yarn plug and which has a width smaller than the cross section of the plug leaving the stuffer box so as to compress the yarn plug. The internal passage of the stuffer box is constructed with a cross section that increases in the direction of advance in such a manner that no significant cohesive force develops on the yarn plug, and the resistance to the forward pressure in the yarn plug resulting from the heated conveying gas is provided essentially only by the force on the yarn plug generated by its compression in the conveying gap.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung und ein Verfahren zum Stauchkräuseln eines synthetischen multifilen Fadens. Hierbei wird der Faden mittels einer Förderdüse durch ein heißes Fördermittel in eine Stauchkammer gefördert und zu einem Fadenstopfen verdichtet. Am Auslaß der Stauchkammer ist ein Walzenpaar zur Förderung des Fadenstopfens angeordnet. Hierbei bildet das Walzenpaar einen Förderspalt mit einer Breite, die kleiner ist als der aus der Stauchkammer austretende Stopfenquerschnitt. Die Stauchkammer ist dabei derart mit in Förderrichtung zunehmendem Querschnitt ausgebildet, daß keine wesentliche Haltekraft am Fadenstopfen entsteht und nur die aufgrund der Stauchung im Förderspalt erzeugte Kraft dem Förderdruck des Fördermittels in der Stauchkammer entgegenwirkt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/122 (2013.01); D02G 1/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982418 A2 20000301; EP 0982418 A3 20030416; EP 0982418 B1 20051221; AT 313652 T 20060115; US 6141843 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150817

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 313652 T

- Effective date: 20150817

2016-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912950

2015-01-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140825

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140826

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140902

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110817

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100824

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2009-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912950 P 20060126

2005-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE IT LI

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE IT LI

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030516

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI