Global Patent Index - EP 0982422 A1

EP 0982422 A1 2000-03-01 - Weft bobbin arrangement and weft bobbin stand for carpet weaving machines

Title (en)

Weft bobbin arrangement and weft bobbin stand for carpet weaving machines

Title (de)

Aufstellung und Ständer für Schussfadenspulen für Teppichwebmaschinen

Title (fr)

Arrangement et support de bobines de trame pour métiers à tisser les tapis

Publication

EP 0982422 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202175 A

Priority

BE 9800628 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a weft bobbin arrangement for carpet weaving machines whereby cross-wound spools (bobbins)(6) with conically wound yarns (10,11) are utilised, with a diameter of more than 200 mm and/or a weight of more than 10 kg, and whereby the bobbins (6) are in each case disposed at least per two on at least two turntables (2,3) so that the central axes of the winding bodies of the bobbins (6) on one turntable are in each case directed towards a common guide eye (7,8) for the yarn thread (10,11), from out of which a thread can be guided towards a pre-spooling device of a weaving machine, while each of the turntables (2,3) and each of the guide eyes (7,8) belonging thereto are so disposed that for all bobbins (6) and in all positions of the turntables (2,3) the bending angle of a thread (10,11) coming from a bobbin to the pre-spooling devices at a guide eye is at most 60 DEG . The invention furthermore relates to a weft bobbin stand (1) (supporting device for the weft bobbins) for a carpet weaving machine, which implements this weft bobbin arrangement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; B65H 49/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 49/12 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/34 (2013.01); B65H 49/12 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982422 A1 20000301; BE 1012130 A3 20000502; TR 9902054 A2 20000321; TR 9902054 A3 20000321

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020618

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020206

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI