Global patent index - EP 0982426 A1

EP 0982426 A1 2000-03-01 - Detergent dispenser for washing machine

Title (en)

Detergent dispenser for washing machine

Title (de)

Waschmittel-Einspülvorrichtung für Waschmaschinen

Title (fr)

Distributeur de détergent de lavage pour machine à laver

Publication

EP 0982426 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115776 A

Priority

DE 19837200 A

Abstract (en)

The bottom part (24) of the housing and the top part (25) of the housing constitute a body in one piece and are joined together by an integral hinge (28) tiltably. The top part (26) is tilted round the hinge (28) onto the bottom part (24) into a position that closes the housing.

Abstract (de)

Waschmittel-Einspülvorrichtung mit einem Einspülschalen-Gehäuse (4), dessen Gehäuseunterteil (24) und Gehäuseoberteil (26) zusammen ein einstückiger Körper sind und durch ein Filmscharnier (28) schwenkbar miteinander verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19837200 A1 20000224; AT 241029 T 20030615; EP 0982426 A1 20000301; EP 0982426 B1 20030521; ES 2199506 T3 20040216

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130810

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130810

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130810

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59905620

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120828

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110831

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090811

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090811

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090810

2010-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20100317

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2199506

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905620

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-05-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: SI

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-11-15 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000818

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000818

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI