Global Patent Index - EP 0982428 A1

EP 0982428 A1 2000-03-01 - Method for feeding laundry pieces to a laundry treatment apparatus

Title (en)

Method for feeding laundry pieces to a laundry treatment apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Zuführen von Wäschestücken zu einer Wäschebehandlungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour amener des pièces de linge à un appareil de traitement du linge

Publication

EP 0982428 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115359 A

Priority

DE 19839004 A

Abstract (en)

To move laundry to the laundering stations, the laundry is clipped manually to a conveyor to be carried into a store zone and then passed to the laundering process. Before the laundry (10) enters the store zone (23), it is scanned to give a relevant value for the laundering equipment, and then passed into the holding zone (23). The scanning action gives the length between two laundry carrier clips (15) at the conveyor (14), holding the edges (13) of each laundry item (10) pref. to give the laundry edge length to be passed into the laundry processing unit, and especially the edge (13) of the laundry (10) across its insertion direction. The edge (13) of the laundry (10) is measured while it is held by the successive carrier clips (15) on the direction of movement (16) of the laundry conveyor (14). A retaining measurement rod gives the laundry edge length as the laundry (10) is moved onwards by the conveyor (14). The onwards movement of the laundry (10) is stopped temporarily before the start of length measurement, for the insertion of the measurement rod into the movement path of the laundry (10). As the laundry (10) is moved onwards, the measurement rod is detached from the edge (13) of the laundry (10) to be measured. The measurement rod is inserted into the laundry movement path between two successive carrier clips (15) which hold neighboring corners of each laundry item (10), and to swing as the laundry travels along with the conveyor (14), so that the carrier clips (15) move past the rod. At the holding zone (23), the laundry (10) is sorted into an intermediate store zone according the measured edge length, to be carried in an appropriate section (24-26) of the holding zone (23). The separate holding stretches (24-26) are arranged according to the number of passes required through the laundry processing unit such as a mangle (11) for the measured laundry edge (13) length. An independent claim is included for a laundry transport assembly with a monitor station for the carried laundry (10) on the conveyor (14) before it reaches the holding zone (23), to register at least one relevant measurement appropriate to the laundry processing unit to take the laundry. Preferred Features: The monitor has a retaining measurement rod, pref. in a U-shape, which swings parallel to the direction of laundry travel with the conveyor. The measurement rod can slide in and out of action across the direction of laundry travel.

Abstract (de)

Wäschestücke (10) werden in Mangeln (11) durch Eingabeeinrichtungen (12) eingegeben. Die Eingabeeinrichtungen (12) verfügen über Spreizklammern, die einen Rand (13) eines jeweiligen Wäschestücks (10) vor der Eingabeeinrichtung (12) ausstrecken, wonach von der Eingabeeinrichtung (12) das jeweilige Wäschestück (10) an die Mangel (11) übergebbar ist. Vielfach werden die Mangeln (11) und die Eingabeeinrichtungen (12) wahlweise ein- oder mehrbahnig betrieben. Dieser Betrieb hängt von der jeweiligen Breite des Randes (13) ab, mit dem das betreffende Wäschestück (10) über die Eingabeeinrichtung (12) in die Mangel (11) eingegeben wird. Um eine zuverlässige Zuordnung der Wäschestücke (10) zum ein- und zweibahnigen Betrieb der Mangel (11) und der Eingabeeinrichtung (12) zu gewährleisten und darüber hinaus die Kapazität der Mangel (11) optimal ausnutzen zu können, ist vorgesehen, den zwischen benachbarten Ecken an zwei Transportklammern (15) gehaltenen Rand (13) jedes Wäschestücks (10) durch einen Meßstab (41) mechanisch zu vermessen und anhand der so ermittelten Länge des Randes (13) das betreffende Wäschestück (10) gezielt ein- oder zweibahnig in die Mangel (11) einzugeben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 67/04; D06F 95/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 67/04 (2006.01); D06F 95/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 67/04 (2013.01); D06F 95/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982428 A1 20000301; EP 0982428 B1 20040303; DE 19839004 A1 20000302; DK 0982428 T3 20040712

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-03-31 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20130831

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110810

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-07-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908699

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR LI NL

2004-03-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2003-09-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR FEEDING LAUNDRY PIECES TO A LAUNDRY TREATMENT APPARATUS

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HERBERT KANNEGIESSER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020517

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE DK FR LI NL

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000225

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR LI NL

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI