Global patent index - EP 0982429 A2

EP 0982429 A2 2000-03-01 - Steam iron

Title (en)

Steam iron

Title (de)

Dampfbügeleisen

Title (fr)

Fer à repasser à vapeur

Publication

EP 0982429 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112297 A

Priority

DE 29815077 U

Abstract (en)

In an electric steam laundry iron, the steam tube (13) leads into a housing (3) with a closing valve (12) for the steam feed (13). A control line (20), for the closing valve (12), leads from the iron to the housing (3). A connecting tube (7) extends from the housing (3) to link the steam generator (11) with the steam pipe (13).

Abstract (de)

Um ein Dampfbügeleisen mit einem Elektrokabel zum Anschluß an eine elektrische Energiequelle und mit einer Dampfleitung zum Anschluß an einen Dampferzeuger so auszubilden, daß es mit einem möglichst einfach aufgebauten Dampferzeuger eingesetzt werden kann und selbst einen möglichst einfachen Aufbau aufweist, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Dampfleitung in ein Gehäuse führt, in dem ein Schließventil für die Dampfleitung angeordnet ist, daß vom Dampfbügeleisen zu dem Gehäuse eine Steuerleitung für das Schließventil führt, und daß aus dem Gehäuse eine Anschlußleitung austritt zur Verbindung des Dampferzeugers mit der Dampfleitung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 75/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815077 U1 19981105; EP 0982429 A2 20000301; EP 0982429 A3 20001129; EP 0982429 B1 20030924

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080626

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070424

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070706

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-10-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907092

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2003-09-24 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALFRED KAERCHER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021004

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR IT LI

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI