Global Patent Index - EP 0982434 A3

EP 0982434 A3 2000-10-25 - Spreader

Title (en)

Spreader

Title (de)

Streugerät

Title (fr)

Epandeur

Publication

EP 0982434 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99114894 A

Priority

DE 19838979 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19838979C1] A scattering apparatus for scattering material from a vehicle, e.g. salt onto a road surface, comprises a container (7) for the material to be scattered, with a base, a base removal and dosing unit (8) and a scattering unit. The base of the container has two sections which can swivel about a longitudinal axis, between a base position and a sloping position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/201 (2013.01); E01C 19/203 (2013.01); E01C 2019/208 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19838979 C1 19991230; EP 0982434 A2 20000301; EP 0982434 A3 20001025

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030505

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010420

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI