Global Patent Index - EP 0982438 A1

EP 0982438 A1 2000-03-01 - Drilling pipe for a jet injection process for soil

Title (en)

Drilling pipe for a jet injection process for soil

Title (de)

Für Düsenstrahlinjektionen in den Baugrund verwendetes Bohrrohr

Title (fr)

Tube de forage pour un procédé d'injection à jet dans le sol

Publication

EP 0982438 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99109137 A

Priority

DE 19838487 A

Abstract (en)

At least one raised profile (13) extends around the outer wall of the drilling pipe (7), the profile thickness being less than the space between the pipe and surrounding soil. Injection material is expelled at high pressure from a nozzle at the bottom end of the pipe, which is rotated during injection. The injection of material such as cement reinforces the soil in order for buildings to be constructed without the use of noisy pile-driving techniques.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein für Düsenstrahlinjektionen in den Baugrund verwendetes Bohrrohr (7), das an seinem unteren Ende mit Düsen versehen ist (11), durch die beim Drehen des Bohrrohres (7) ein Injektionsmittel unter hohem Druck nach außen in den anstehenden Boden (3) zur Bildung eines verfestigten Bodenkörpers preßbar ist. Um zu verhindern, daß ein Rohrstillstand beim Ziehen des Rohres (7) durch Verfestigung des zwischen dem Bohrrohr (7) und dem anstehenden Boden aufsteigenden Injektionsmittels zu verhindern, ist auf der Außenwand des Bohrrohres (7) wenigstens eine das Bohrrohr umfassende und weitgehend geschlossene Aufhöhung (13) angebracht, deren Dicke kleiner als der verfahrensmäßig bedingte Zwischenraum zwischen Bohrrohr (7) und Erdreich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 7/26 (2006.01); E02D 5/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 7/26 (2013.01); E02D 5/54 (2013.01); E02D 2200/16 (2013.01); E02D 2250/003 (2013.01); E02D 2300/0023 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 3926787 A1 19910214 - HOLZMANN PHILIPP AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982438 A1 20000301; DE 19838487 C1 20000323

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [R18R] REFUSED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-02-04 [D18R] REFUSED (DELETED)

2003-09-10 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20020601

2003-09-10 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-01-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020308

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI