Global Patent Index - EP 0982439 A1

EP 0982439 A1 2000-03-01 - Front loader boom

Title (en)

Front loader boom

Title (de)

Frontladerausleger

Title (fr)

Flèche de chargeur frontal

Publication

EP 0982439 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99115855 A

Priority

GB 9818515 A

Abstract (en)

A front loader consists of two loader arms (1, 18) laterally spaced apart, and which can be hinge-mounted on a carrier vehicle about a horizontal axis. Each arm comprises first and second arm elements (2, 3) and a parallel guide linkage (11-17) to control movement of a work tool (10) when the loader arm is pivoted. In order to accommodate different chordal measurements (S1, S2) whilst retaining the largest possible number of common parts, it is proposed that the loader arms (1, 18) of a range have a common vehicle-end element (3) and the differing chordal measurement (S1, S2) is set by means of elements (2, 19) of differing lengths at the tool -end, the angle subtended by the first joint (7, 22), the second joint (13, 23) and the third joint (14, 20) being of the same size for all loader arms (1, 18) in the range. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/34 (2006.01); E02F 3/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982439 A1 20000301; EP 0982439 B1 20040128; AT 258624 T 20040215; CZ 298065 B6 20070613; CZ 9903038 A3 20000315; DE 69914424 D1 20040304; DE 69914424 T2 20041111; GB 2340816 A 20000301; GB 2340816 B 20021009; GB 9818515 D0 19981021

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100813

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100812

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69914424

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100812

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100812

2011-03-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090813

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914424 P 20040304

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021209

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB SE

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000306

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI