Global Patent Index - EP 0982440 A3

EP 0982440 A3 2000-10-18 - Engine hood guard

Title (en)

Engine hood guard

Title (de)

Schutz für Motorhaube

Title (fr)

Protection pour capot moteur

Publication

EP 0982440 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99115889 A

Priority

GB 9818481 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0982440A2] An engine hood guard for a carrier vehicle of a flange-mounted front-loader is described, which has, arranged to the side of the engine bonnet (1) at the rear region thereof, brackets (2) for receiving the coupling members (3) of the front-loader, having an impact guard (4) in the front region to prevent the engine hood (1) from being damaged when mounting and de-mounting the front-loader. The guard extends, starting from the impact guard (4), along either side of the engine hood (1) at least as far as the brackets (2) and is designed to act as a lateral guiding aid for the coupling members. The engine hood guard is suitable for all carrier vehicles which are designed to be mounted with de-mountable front-loaders. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/34; E02F 3/627

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62D 25/10 (2006.01); E02F 3/34 (2006.01); E02F 3/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/627 (2013.01); E02F 3/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982440 A2 20000301; EP 0982440 A3 20001018; EP 0982440 B1 20070214; AT 353998 T 20070315; CZ 297193 B6 20060913; CZ 9903037 A3 20000315; DE 69935096 D1 20070329; DE 69935096 T2 20071122; GB 2340815 A 20000301; GB 2340815 B 20021009; GB 9818481 D0 19981021

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100813

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100812

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69935096

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100812

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100812

2011-03-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090813

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071115

2007-10-05 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-10-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AGCO GMBH

2007-06-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69935096 P 20070329

2007-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

2007-02-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041025

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001201

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI