Global Patent Index - EP 0982443 A2

EP 0982443 A2 2000-03-01 - Device for connecting a structural beam member and a supported structural member

Title (en)

Device for connecting a structural beam member and a supported structural member

Title (de)

Verbindungsvorrichtung zwischen einem Profilträger und einem aufgelagerten Profil

Title (fr)

Dispositif de liaison entre une poutre profilée et un profilé supporté

Publication

EP 0982443 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115936 A

Priority

DE 29815504 U

Abstract (en)

The connecting device has a clamping element formed as screw (13) which in region of its thread, works on tapered surface (19) of flanged bolt (5). The axis (3a) of the transverse bore (3) is arranged at the middle of the length of connector (1). The thread shaft of the screw is slightly longer than half the length of the connector.

Abstract (de)

Die toleranzunempfindliche Verbindungsvorrichtung weist einen Verbinder (1) auf, der mit einer Verankerungsleiste (2) für die formschlüssige Festlegung in einer hinterschnittenen Nut (17) des L-förmigen Tragprofils (14) versehen ist. Der Verbinder ist mit zwei sich kreuzenden Bohrungen ausgerüstet, und zwar mit einer mittig angeordneten, durchgehenden Querbohrung (3), die teilweise eine Längsbohrung (12) durchsetzt. In die Querbohrung (3) wird der kegelförmige Bund (4) eines Bundbolzens (5) eingeführt, wobei der Bund (4) mit Spiel in die Querbohrung (3) eingreift. Der Bundbolzen erstreckt sich mit einem Gewindeschaft durch die Wand eines Sparrenprofils (10), das auf den Schenkel (16) des L-förmigen Profilträgers (14) aufliegt und am Schenkel (15) des Profilträgers (14) anliegt. Mit der Kegelfläche des Bundbolzens arbeitet ein Spannelement zusammen, das als Schraube ausgebildet ist, die im Bereich ihres Gewindes auf die Kegelfläche (19) des Bundbolzens (5) wirkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/147 (2006.01); E04D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1478 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0875 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0615072 A1 19940914 - ALCAN FRANCE [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815504 U1 19981217; EP 0982443 A2 20000301; EP 0982443 A3 20010711; EP 0982443 B1 20040915; ES 2224506 T3 20050301

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-06-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910498

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090814

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100809

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090814

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070813

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070813

2008-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHUCO INTERNATIONAL K.G.

- Effective date: 20070831

2006-08-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060828

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2224506 T3

2004-11-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910498 P 20041021

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 7/04 A, 7E 04D 13/14 B, 7E 04D 3/08 B, 7F 16B 39/04 B

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 1/58 A, 7F 16B 39/02 B, 7E 04B 1/00 B, 7E 04B 7/04 B, 7E 04D 13/14 B

2000-03-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR CONNECTING A STRUCTURAL BEAM MEMBER AND A SUPPORTED STRUCTURAL MEMBER

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI