Global patent index - EP 0982445 A1

EP 0982445 A1 2000-03-01 - Insulating profile

Title (en)

Insulating profile

Title (de)

Isolierprofil

Title (fr)

Profil d'isolation

Publication

EP 0982445 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116137 A

Priority

DE 19838175 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19838175C1] A bow-shaped leaf spring (6) is attached to one side of the inner surface of the rectangular shaped hollow profile (2). After the insulating material (8), made of polyurethane of Styrofoam (RTM), has been inserted, it is held in place by the tension caused by the spring, being squeezed against the opposite wall (9) inside the profile. No glue has to be added to the insulating material or can leak from the profile afterwards.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Isolierprofil mit einem Dämmkörper (8), welcher in einem Hohlraum (4; 16) im Inneren des Isolierprofils (2; 14) durch zumindest ein Federelement (6; 10; 12) gehalten wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/88; E06B 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/78 (2006.01); E06B 3/22 (2006.01); E06B 3/263 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/221 (2013.01); E04B 1/78 (2013.01); E06B 3/2632 (2013.01); E06B 3/222 (2013.01); E06B 2003/225 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26321 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26352 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19838175 C1 19991202; EP 0982445 A1 20000301

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041007

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030718

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOSEF GARTNER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB LU NL

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB LU NL

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI