Global Patent Index - EP 0982451 A1

EP 0982451 A1 2000-03-01 - Multistorey parking garage and device for parking floor identification

Title (en)

Multistorey parking garage and device for parking floor identification

Title (de)

Mehretagiges Parkhaus sowie Gerät zur Identifikation einer Parketage

Title (fr)

Parking à plusieurs étages et appareil pour l'identification d'un étage de parking

Publication

EP 0982451 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115740 A

Priority

DE 29815185 U

Abstract (en)

The car park has a controller for the central entry point and an output device for delivering a parking ticket when the controller is activated. A device independent of the central entry point controller is arranged on each level in the vicinity of the exit from the level, esp. a personal exit or a stair well. This device identifies the level with a printer which prints a level indicator on the parking ticket and has a ticket input and output slot.

Abstract (de)

In einem mehretagigen Parkhaus, insbesondere mit einer zentralen Zufahrtschranke, mit einer Steuereinrichtung der Zufahrtschranke und einer Ausgabeeinrichtung zur Ausgabe eines Parktickets bei Betätigung der Steuereinrichtung der zentralen Zufahrtschranke soll die Identifizierung der jeweils benutzten Parketage mit einfachen technischen Mitteln erleichtert werden. Hierzu ist in jeder Parketage im Bereich eines Etagenausgangs ein von der Steuereinrichtung der Zufahrtschranke unabhängiges Gerät zur Identifikation der Parketage mit einem Drucker, der zum Druck eines Etagenaufdrucks auf dem Parkticket ausgebildet ist, sowie mit einem Parkticketaufnahme- und -ausgabeschlitz in einem Gehäuse des Geräts angeordnet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 6/42; G07B 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 6/42 (2006.01); G07B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/04 (2013.01); E04H 6/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815185 U1 19981203; EP 0982451 A1 20000301

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030208

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI