Global patent index - EP 0982455 A2

EP 0982455 A2 2000-03-01 - Furniture hinge

Title (en)

Furniture hinge

Title (de)

Möbelscharnier

Title (fr)

Charnière de meuble

Publication

EP 0982455 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116246 A

Priority

  • AT 150298 A
  • AT 144198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6266848B1] A hinge with adjusting devices has a hinge arm with a U-profile that can be secured to a base plate by an intermediate piece, and is connected to a hinge cup by articulated hinge links. The base plate has a mounting plane for abutting a furniture side wall in a mounted position. The position of the hinge arm is adjustable with respect to the base plate in a plane perpendicular to the mounting plane by means of an adjustment screw. Guides are provided for guiding the hinge arm in a direction of the depth of a piece of furniture when the position of the hinge arm is adjusted the adjustment screw. Two intermediate pieces are connected to the hinge arm before the hinge arm is mounted on the base plate. One intermediate piece is fixable to base plate by a spring locking mechanism, ad the other piece is slidably mounted on the first intermediate piece for slidable displacement in the direction of the depth of the piece of furniture.

Abstract (de)

Ein Möbelscharnier mit einem auf einer Grundplatte (4) gelagerten Scharnierarm (10), der mittels Gelenkhebel (23) mit einem Scharniertopf (3) verbunden ist. Die Grundplatte (4) liegt im montierten Zustand mit einer Montagefläche (55) an einer Möbelseitenwand (1) an und in den Scharnierarm (10) ist eine Fugenverstellschraube (13) eingeschraubt, die in einem Zwischenstück (17) drehbar, aber in axialer Richtung unverschieblich verankert ist, mittels der Fugenverstellschraube (13) ist die Position des Scharnierarms (10) in einer zur Montagefläche (55) der Grundplatte (4) senkrechten Ebene zur seitlichen Verstellung einer Türe (2) veränderbar. Es ist eine Führung vorgesehen ist, die den Scharnierarm (10) in dessen Längsrichtung führt und eine weitere Führung, durch die der Scharnierarm (10) bei einer Verdrehung der Fugenverstellschraube (13) sowohl parallel zur Montagefläche (53) der Grundplatte (4) verschoben als auch in einer senkrecht zu dieser Montagefläche (55) ausgerichtete Ebene verschwenkt wird. Vor der Montage des Scharnierarms (10) auf der Grundplatte (4) sind zwei Zwischenstücke (5, 17) in den Scharnierarm (10) eingehängt, wovon eines, wenn der Scharnierarm (10) auf der Grundplatte (4) verankert ist, auf der Grundplatte (4) starr gehalten ist, während das zweite Zwischenstück (17) auf dem ersten Zwischenstück (5) in der Richtung der Tiefe des Möbels verschiebbar gelagert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/12; E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/04 (2006.01); E05D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0407 (2013.01); E05D 7/123 (2013.01); E05D 7/125 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53238 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53253 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982455 A2 20000301; EP 0982455 A3 20030813; EP 0982455 B1 20050126; BR 9903834 A 20000829; DE 59911516 D1 20050303; ES 2236998 T3 20050716; US 6266848 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151029

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-08-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050816

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2236998

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911516

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2004-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JULIUS BLUM GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2004-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI