Global Patent Index - EP 0982456 A2

EP 0982456 A2 2000-03-01 - Single panelled overhead door with a counterbalancing device using a lever mechanism

Title (en)

Single panelled overhead door with a counterbalancing device using a lever mechanism

Title (de)

Einblatt-Überkopftor mit einer über ein Hebelwerk wirkenden Gewichtsausgleichseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Porte basculante à panneau unique avec dispositif d'équilibrage utilisant un mécanisme de levier

Publication

EP 0982456 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116954 A

Priority

DE 29815487 U

Abstract (en)

The spring band (15) is designed to pass round the lever bearing (78) so that in the closed door the lever (7) is loaded with a pre-tension force passing through or near the lever pivot axis (A). The spring encloses the bearing (78) in a spring recess or step (77) and a pre-tensioner is provided to adjust the pre-tension of the door plate (2) from the closed setting. This pre-tensioner includes a support for the spring in the recessed area set so the spring (15) thrusts off the door case (1) or connected part so the spring itself acts as transmission lever to pre-tension door from closed via the effect of the spring acting on the lever (7). The support specified consists of an adjuster screw (85) located at set length in a tapped spring hole.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Einblatt-Überkopftor (100, 200, 300) mit einer über ein Hebelwerk (5) wirkenden Gewichtsausgleichseinrichtung (8), die ein Dehnungs- oder Zugfederelement (14) zum Ausgleichen des Torblattgewichts aufweist, wobei das Dehnungsfederelement (14) über ein Federband (15) an einem Hebelarm (61) eines über ein Hebellager (78) schwenkbar gelagerten, andernends mit dem Torblatt (2) verbundenen Hebels (7) des Hebelwerks (5) angelenkt ist, besser an einen Motorbetrieb anpassen zu können, wird vorgeschlagen, daß das Federband (15) derart angeordnet und/oder ausgebildet ist, daß es um das Hebellager (78) herumführbar ist, so daß der Hebel (7) bei geschlossenem Torblatt (2) mit einem durch die oder nahe der Schwenkachse (A) des Hebels (7) vorbei führenden Vorspannkraftfluß beaufschlagbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 13/00; E05F 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 13/00 (2006.01); E05D 15/42 (2006.01); E05F 1/10 (2006.01); E06B 1/52 (2006.01); E05D 15/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 13/1215 (2013.01); E06B 1/522 (2013.01); E05D 15/401 (2013.01); E05D 15/425 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/488 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/21 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/696 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815487 U1 20000113; EP 0982456 A2 20000301; EP 0982456 A3 20011031; EP 0982456 B1 20041103

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161014

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59910976

- Representative's name: KASTEL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070827

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050322

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910976 P 20041209

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011129

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI