Global Patent Index - EP 0982458 A1

EP 0982458 A1 2000-03-01 - Device for assisting in the opening and closing of a vehicle boot lid

Title (en)

Device for assisting in the opening and closing of a vehicle boot lid

Title (de)

Hilfsvorrichtung zum Öffnen und Schliessen von einem Kofferraumdeckel eines Kraftfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'assistance à l'ouverture et à la fermeture d'une porte d'un coffre de véhicule

Publication

EP 0982458 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440218 A

Priority

FR 9810664 A

Abstract (en)

The motor vehicle hatch gas strut (17) is pivoted (18,19) to the hatch and vehicle body, one of which is movable by a motor (25) so that the lever arm for the force exerted by the strut can be varied. The motor can move the pivot via a drive screw.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un dispositif d'assistance (10) à l'ouverture et à la fermeture notamment d'un hayon arrière (11) de véhicule, simple, économique, peu encombrant, pratique, contrôlable, qui permet de diminuer au maximum l'effort fourni par l'utilisateur pour ouvrir ou fermer la porte du coffre, voire d'obtenir une ouverture et une fermeture automatique de la porte. Ce dispositif d'assistance (10) utilise l'organe de poussée (17), tel qu'un vérin à gaz ou à ressort, qui est couplé par des articulations (18, 19) aux éléments de carrosserie (15) et à ladite porte (11). Il est caractérisé en ce qu'au moins une des articulations de couplage (18) est montée sur un mécanisme de commande (20) agencé pour la déplacer d'une position basse (P1) à une position haute (P2) et inversement pour modifier de façon prédéterminée le bras de levier de la force de poussée générée par ledit organe de poussée dans le but de faciliter l'ouverture et la fermeture de ladite porte. Ce mécanisme de commande (20) peut comporter un écrou libre, recevant ladite articulation (18), entraîné en translation par une vis sans fin couplée à un moteur électrique. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 1/10 (2006.01); E05F 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 1/1091 (2013.01); E05F 15/622 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/546 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] DE 19758130 A1 19980917 - SUSPA COMPART AG [DE]
  • [A] "DECK LID COUNTERBALANCE", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 310, 1 February 1990 (1990-02-01), pages 135, XP000087018

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982458 A1 20000301; FR 2782536 A1 20000225; FR 2782536 B1 20001013

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020201

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI