Global Patent Index - EP 0982467 A3

EP 0982467 A3 2000-10-11 - Drill for obtaining soil samples

Title (en)

Drill for obtaining soil samples

Title (de)

Bohrer zur Bodenprobenentnahme

Title (fr)

Foret pour le prélèvement d'échantillons de sol

Publication

EP 0982467 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99115710 A

Priority

DE 19838199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0982467A2] The drilling device (100) can be joined to a tractor (200). It comprises of a drill tool (60), driven by a motor (10), which operates an elevating spindle (20) and moves up and down a guide column (30) together with the drill (60). A clearing device (70) is moved along the drill (60), when this is rotated in the opposite direction, removing the soil from the coiled surface. The soil is collected in a small container (80). Because the steel band (64), forming the helical surface of the drill (60), is wider at the periphery and narrower lose to the central axis the soil is slightly compressed and does not fall from the drill accidentally.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/44; E21B 17/22; E21B 49/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/44 (2006.01); E21B 12/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/44 (2013.01); E21B 12/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0982467 A2 20000301; EP 0982467 A3 20001011; DE 19838199 C1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE DK FR GB

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 21B 10/44 A, 7E 21B 49/02 B, 7E 21B 17/22 B

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR GB

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI